STOKE NEWINGTON COMMUNITY EXCHANGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has received a grant from Safer London Foundation to run a victim support project. Fund has been raised by climbing the Kilimanjaro in Kenya, doing the marathon and cycle rally.The charity received a grant from Awards for All for adult lessons. Pete Brennan Trust Fund donates money to free school meals students for uniforms and support them to take part in school trips.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 05 December 2007: Standard registration
- 04 January 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FRIENDS OF STOKE NEWINGTON SCHOOL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.86k | £580 | £1.45k | £0 | £30 | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.67k | £562 | £144 | £216 | £144 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 24 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 24 July 2014 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/11/2007 AS AMENDED ON 06/12/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS THEIR FAMILIES AND THE COMMUNITY WITHIN STOKE NEWINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STOKE NEWINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
STOKE NEWINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window