THE PENSIONS ARCHIVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Education of public about occupational and personal pension schemes in UK, Northern Ireland, Isle of Man and Channel Islands. 2. Education regarding establishment and maintenance of such schemes. 3. Provision of study resource for everyone with an interest in such schemes. 4. Establishment of permanent archive(s) for this purpose. 5. Acceptance of relevant donations and materials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Roberts | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Gary William Yeaman | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alkesh Shah | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
MILES GRANT LORE BAHonsFPMI | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY HIGHFIELD | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|||||
JANE MARGARET MARSHALL LL.B | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr YALLY AVRAHAMPOUR PhD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.20k | £8.38k | £7.22k | £11.25k | £30.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.11k | £7.09k | £9.38k | £11.95k | £32.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 16 AUGUST 2005 as amended on 19 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE OF ALL ASPECTS OF OCCUPATIONAL AND PERSONAL PENSION SCHEMES AS OPERATED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, NORTHERN IRELAND, THE ISLE OF MAN AND THE CHANNEL ISLANDS 2 TO EDUCATE THOSE INVOLVED IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF SUCH SCHEMES 3 TO PROVIDE AN EASILY ACCESSIBLE RESOURCE TO STUDENTS STUDYING FOR FIRST DEGREE, POST GRADUATE COURSES, QUALIFICATIONS IN PENSIONS AND OTHER RELATED PROFESSIONS, ACADEMICS, LAWYERS, ACTUARIES, COMMUNICATIONS SPECIALISTS, ECONOMISTS, POLITICIANS, POLITICAL PARTIES, JOURNALISTS, INSURANCE COMPANIES, INVESTMENT MANAGERS, TRADE UNIONS, EMPLOYERS, EMPLOYEES, PENSION MANAGERS, PENSIONS SCHEME TRUSTEES, SECRETARIES TO TRUSTEES OF PENSION SCHEMES, NATIONAL AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, RESEARCHERS AND OTHERS INCLUDING ALL INVOLVED IN THE PROVISION OF PENSIONS FOR THE RETIRED, SICK OR DISABLED OR OTHERWISE INVOLVED IN SUCH ACTIVITY THAT MAY NECESSITATE ACCESS TO SUCH A RESOURCE 4)TO ESTABLISH ONE OR MORE PERMANENT ARCHIVES OR LIBRARIES 5)TO CHARGE SUCH FEES FOR ADMISSION TO VIEW ANY ARCHIVE OR LIBRARY WHICH MAY BE ESTABLISHED BY TH E CHARITY OR OTHERWISE IN PURSUANCE OF THE OBJECTS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK IS NECESSARY AND APPROPRIATE SO AS TO ADVANCE THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY 6)TO ACCEPT OR REFUSE DONATIONS OF FUNDS OR MATERIALS WHICH ACCORD WITH THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY THROUGH AND BY SUCH MEANS AS MAY BE APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME 7)TO PURSUE SUCH OTHER MEANS TO ACHIEVE THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AS MAY BSE APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Beech Way
Wheathampstead
ST. ALBANS
AL4 8LY
- Phone:
- 07891789433
- Email:
- ask.lma@cityoflondon.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window