CHRISTIAN ACTION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Action UK seeks to raise interest, support and finance for the care of orphaned, handicapped and abandoned children in Qinghai Province (China) through the co-management of Xining Children's Home & Welfare Centre, and in a number of new orphanages being built in Qinghai.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- China
- Hong Kong
Governance
- 15 August 2007: Standard registration
- 13 October 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.82k | £2.70k | £6.04k | £3.74k | £4.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £20.01k | £13 | £13 | £13 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN CHINA OR ELSEWHERE BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS FROM CHINA OR ELSEWHERE PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF LEGAL AND OTHER ADVICE. 3 TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS IN CHINA OR ELSEWHERE, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR REHABILITATION AND MEANS TO RECEIVE SUCH TREATMENT, CARE OR REHABILITATION. 4 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN CHINA AND ELSEWHERE IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
CHINA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window