Financial history SOUTHAM CHURCH AND COMMUNITY PROJECT LTD

Charity number: 1125448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £70.35k £70.35k £79.69k £91.33k £107.19k
Total expenditure £71.70k £71.70k £63.38k £97.51k £107.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £4.50k N/A
Income from government grants £300 £31.63k £6.56k £2.63k £11.50k