EMERGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of accommodation and help for individuals with special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 11 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Jeanette Limbert | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
samantha christine weeks | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA LESLEY LIAS | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £345.02k | £349.31k | £236.99k | £333.01k | £355.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £291.52k | £371.35k | £324.13k | £415.37k | £422.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 March 2024 | 405 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 March 2024 | 405 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2024 | 721 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2024 | 721 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 JUNE 2007 AND AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEED DATED 20 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
2.2.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF A CENTRE FOR SUPPORT, ADVICE, TREATMENT AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES OF ACCOMMODATION FOR THOSE IN NEED; 2.2.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, AMONG THOSE SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION ON ALL ASPECTS OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE AND ITS EFFECTS AND BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING OR RETRAINING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUFFERERS; 2..2.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF PROPERTIES OWNED OR MANAGED BY THE CHARITY; AND 2.2.4 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO, BY REASON OF THEIR YOUNG AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR OTHER SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BEING PRIMARILY BUT NOT LIMITED TO RESIDENTS OF PROPERTIES OWNED OR MANAGED BY THE CHARITY. 2.2.5 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION TO HOMELESS PERSONS IN THE BRISTOL AREA WHETHER THEY ARE SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DRUG DEPENDENCY OR NOT.
Area of benefit
AVON - BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Grove Avenue
Coombe Dingle
BRISTOL
BS9 2RP
- Phone:
- 07932691729
- Email:
- info@emerge-bristol.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window