Accounts and annual returns THE INSPIRATION ACADEMY

Charity Number: 1121088
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 05 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2008 05 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required