FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL MARSDEN, SURREY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To supplement the services provided by the Royal Marsden Hospital, Sutton by contributing to the provision of facilities, refurbishments and equipmentthat may benefit the health, welfare or comfort of its patients, former patients, their families or staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £367.00k | £394.71k | £459.08k | £999.59k | £308.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £369.12k | £367.48k | £538.10k | £548.98k | £258.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £540.13k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £43.24k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £413.18k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.04k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £495.99k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £269.65k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £276.98k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.35k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 13 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 13 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 16 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | 16 November 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 19 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 19 May 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 28 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 28 April 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2015 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO SUPPLEMENT THE SERVICE PROVIDED BY THE ROYAL MARSDEN HOSPITAL FOR THE HEALTH WELFARE AND COMFORT OF THE PATIENTS THEREIN BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVIDING OF EQUIPMENT FACILITIES AND SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE COUNTY OF SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window