PINCHBECK KIDS CLUB

Charity number: 1122495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVISION OF OUT OF SCHOOL CARE FOR CHILDREN BETWEEN 4 AND 11 AS WELL AS A HOLIDAY CLUB FOR THE SAME GROUP WHEN SCHOOLS ARE CLOSED

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £96,719
Total expenditure: £84,163

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER REX SCHOFIELD Chair
PINCHBECK VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Felicia Pieleanu Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Adriane Sant' Ana Trustee 05 April 2022
None on record
Tsvetomira Pavlova Trustee 05 April 2022
None on record
Hayley Louise Thompson Trustee 05 April 2022
None on record
Mihaela Mandache Trustee 05 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £75.94k £43.54k £75.56k £81.31k £96.72k
Total expenditure £77.10k £72.94k £67.58k £65.47k £84.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.46k £1.22k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 April 2021 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 April 2021 78 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Pavillion
Pinchbeck East Primary School
Fennell Road Pinchbeck
SPALDING
Lincolns
Phone:
01775 718662