CLARE KING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Clare King Charitable Trust seeks to support specific causes / projects run by other organizations particularly in the area of medical research, children, the elderly and less able.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 05 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally-Ann Feldman | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Feldman | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN ERRINGTON MADDISON | Trustee |
|
||||||
LOUISE REBECCA MADDISON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.20k | £11.59k | £14.35k | £23.28k | £33.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.30k | £4.44k | £60.92k | £41.79k | £35.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 11 May 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 April 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Fardells Lane
Elsworth
Cambridge
CB23 4JE
- Phone:
- 01954267347
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window