Financial history SWINDON E-LEARNING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126388
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £3.97k £83 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.30k £872 £2.46k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A