THE ROPER FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1120400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trustees support charities in and around the Bath area in North Somerset. Trust is open to applications. Please submit your application to https://funding.ludlowtrust.com

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 25 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 August 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ludlow Trust Company Ltd Trustee 06 April 2021
THE MARY STEPHANIE WARREN-COLEMAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE KATHLEEN LAURENCE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PLASTOW FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WESTCOTT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE JECTUS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE HSWJ TRUST
Received: On time
THE J VAN MARS FOUNDATION
Received: 1 day late
THE THOMPSON6 CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CARLILE FOUNDATION CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
PAULINE MEREDITH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JOSEPH ETTEDGUI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE RELITHAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOAN MARY WOODHAM HURRELL TRUST
Received: On time
THE TORNS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WHITEWATER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ETTLING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DR CORAL IRMGARD ALLWORTHY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAYBACK TIME TRUST
Received: On time
THE REGINALD M PHILLIPS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CJM AND FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CORTON HILL TRUST
Received: On time
THE FRAXINUS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GNINWOD TRUST
Received: On time
MILLIE'S WATCH
Received: On time
THE ORKNEY CHERRY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE POLMAX CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE 4 BETTER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE AITKEN FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE AQUEDUCT CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BROWN SOURCE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHIGA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE EDWARD & CATHERINE WRAY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE HURST LEA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LINDLEY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MAURICE AND SUSAN ROTHSCHILD INCENTIVE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROWLAND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SAMUEL FELDMAN NORTH EAST CORNER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SCSJD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LINDSAY TRUST
Received: On time
The Brindle Foundation
Received: On time
THE PRAFARATA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MARGARET ELIZABETH CORMACK CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE KENNETH MONTAGUE DICKINSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DISCWORLD FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARK ROPER Trustee 12 March 2015
JAMIE'S FARM
Received: On time
SOUTH WEST ACTION FOR LEARNING AND LIVING OUR WAY LIMITED
Received: On time
KING EDWARD'S SCHOOL BATH
Received: On time
PAUL ROPER Trustee 12 March 2015
BATH MOZARTFEST LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/07/2020 25/07/2021 25/07/2022 25/07/2023 25/07/2024
Total gross income £508.93k £660.83k £596.77k £449.30k £548.76k
Total expenditure £444.97k £608.18k £593.06k £582.64k £619.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.79m £733.74k £3.47m N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £1.79m £733.74k £3.47m N/A £0
Income - Investment £122.34k £101.78k £151.76k N/A £312.24k
Income - Other £0 £559.05k £445.01k N/A £236.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £444.97k £608.18k £566.90k N/A £587.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £26.15k N/A £32.73k
Expenditure - Governance £2.52k £2.10k £2.10k N/A £2.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £397.70k £571.00k £519.50k N/A £553.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £26.15k N/A £32.73k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 25/07/2020 25/07/2021 25/07/2022 25/07/2023 25/07/2024
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Long-term investments £3.98m £4.75m £7.42m N/A £7.47m
Other assets £691.32k £985.83k £1.07m N/A £1.19m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities £16.53k £3.72k £22.99k N/A £83.64k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 July 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2024 08 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 July 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2023 18 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 July 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2022 15 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 July 2021 12 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2021 12 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 July 2020 01 July 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2020 01 July 2021 37 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
1st Floor
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
Phone:
01173138200