COLDSTREAM KIDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising and grant giving
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 November 2007: Standard registration
- 20 February 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 February 2017: Funds transferred to 1167271 VETERANS LIFELINE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.32k | £5.52k | £1.07k | £611 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.38k | £2.03k | £1.02k | £2.26k | £41.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 15 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 07 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 19 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 17 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 16 YEARS OF BOTH FORMER AND SERVING MEMBERS OF THE COLDSTREAM GUARDS WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY BY: A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window