THE FAMILY SURVIVAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and counselling for members of abusive cults and organisations, and their families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 2007: Standard registration
- SURVIVE (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Lawrence | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandra Stein | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Brown | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steven Norcliffe | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Hart | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
TOM SACKVILLE | Trustee | 01 November 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.61k | £1.09k | £3.31k | £5.38k | £7.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.29k | £6.60k | £1.68k | £5.52k | £5.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN THE ALLEVIATION OF MENTAL SUFFERING, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC RESULTING FROM THEIR MEMBERSHIP, AFFILIATION OR RELATIONSHIP, WITH ANY ORGANISATION OR GROUPS, WHETHER OR NOT ESTABLISHED WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE. (B) TO ASSIST AND COUNSEL THE FAMILIES OR FRIENDS OF ANY SUCH PERSONS WHO MAY THEMSELVES BE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A CONSEQUENCE OF THE ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O THE FAMILY SURVIVAL TRUST
BM BOX 2306
LONDON
WC1N 3XX
- Phone:
- 08456037121
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window