THE FRIENDS OF SAINT STEPHEN ON THE CLIFFS BLACKPOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the preservation, repair, maintenance, improvement, upkeep and restoration of Saint Stephen on the Cliffs Parish Church and the parish centre and grounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Blackpool
Governance
- 06 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew James Teather | Chair | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Anne Berry | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Whitehead | Trustee | 21 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Audrey McLennan | Trustee | 21 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Keith McLennan | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Walter John Cairns | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER GREEN | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY GRAHAM | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|||||
IAN BUTTERWORTH | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.30k | £15.30k | £18.75k | £21.64k | £17.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.12k | £31.30k | £31.17k | £30.67k | £25.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 March 2024 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH JULY 2007
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, EXTENSION, UPKEEP, BEAUTIFICATION, AND RESTORATION OF SAINT STEPHEN'S AND THE PARISH CENTRE, CHURCHYARD AND GROUNDS INCLUDING WHERE APPROPRIATE THE REPLACEMENT OR MAKING OF ADDITIONS TO ANY MONUMENT, FITTING, FIXTURE, GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENT, ORGAN, BELL OR CHATTEL IN THE CHURCH, PARISH CENTRE, CHURCHYARD OR GROUNDS.
Area of benefit
UN DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BLACKPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. STEPHENS VICARAGE
ST. STEPHENS AVENUE
BLACKPOOL
FY2 9RB
- Phone:
- 01253 370456
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window