Financial history ACACIA FAMILY SUPPORT

Charity number: 1122831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £488.34k £528.46k £564.85k £744.98k £724.32k
Total expenditure £420.16k £424.58k £603.28k £763.84k £717.84k
Income from government contracts £158.19k £195.00k £242.89k £341.73k £247.07k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £174.81k £199.34k £282.79k £342.68k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £353.23k £364.09k £461.70k £378.08k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £411 £1.42k £485 £3.56k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £392.80k £558.75k £711.68k £671.95k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £31.78k £44.53k £52.16k £45.89k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.25k £2.87k £2.00k £1.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0