Financial history OLDHAM GATEWAY CLUB

Charity number: 1120780
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £13.37k £12.45k £11.59k £6.07k £4
Total expenditure £11.57k £10.58k £11.94k £7.77k £268
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A