Accounts and annual returns SIMPLE NEEDS

Charity number: 1121199
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2011 02 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2010 02 September 2011 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2009 03 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2009 02 September 2009 On Time