THE DORFMAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees hold the Trust Capital and income generated from it to pay or apply towards or for the benefit of such charitable purposes or charitable institutions as the trustees , at their absolute discretion determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY WAGERMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHARLES SAMUEL DORFMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMY ISABEL LUX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER LEACH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SOPHIE JEAN DORFMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH ANN DORFMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sir Lloyd Dorfman CVO OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.49k | £166.51k | £142.59k | £108.62k | £76.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34m | £1.43m | £1.18m | £517.37k | £1.31m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 FEBRUARY 2007 as amended on 31 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
1.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE ALL OR ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. IT IS RECOGNISED THAT THE DEFINITION OF WHAT IS 'CHARITABLE' ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW CHANGES OVER TIME AND IT IS INTENDED THAT (WHILST NOTHING SHOULD BE DONE WHICH IS NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AT THE DATE THAT IT IS DONE) THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST SHOULD CHANGE IN LINE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND SO THAT IN THE FUTURE THINGS MAY BE DONE (WHEN THEY ARE CHARITABLE) WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE AT THE DATE OF THIS DEED. 1.3 THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE PAID OR APPLIED AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT THE INCOME AND IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS. 1.4 THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE TRUST IN ANY YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME AND HOLD THE SAME AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE TRUST ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 MANCHESTER SQUARE
LONDON
W1U 3PT
- Phone:
- +442077251221
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window