TOUCHSTONE PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Touchstone Projects supports motivational and inspirational programmes in prisons and immigration detention centres in the UK and abroad. Other supported projects include educational programmes in Africa as well as poverty and disaster relief in Africa and Asia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
- South Africa
- Uganda
Governance
- 19 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NILESH PATEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Philip Foy | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Lykins | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.88k | £41.41k | £23.09k | £14.09k | £44.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.54k | £15.58k | £22.34k | £15.69k | £36.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE: * TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION MAINLY BUT NOT ONLY IN PRISONS, YOUNG OFFENDER INSTITUTES AND IMMIGRATION REMOVAL CENTRES IN THE UK AND ABROAD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND SERVICES; THE PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION OF LITERATURE ON CHRISTIAN THEMES TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. * THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF (MAINLY BUT NOT ONLY) FORMER PRISON AND YOUNG OFFENDER INSTITUTES INMATES AND EX-IMMIGRATION REMOVAL CENTRE DETAINEES BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS OR BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR SUCH GOODS OR SERVICES. * TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF (MAINLY BUT NOT ONLY) PRESENT AND FORMER PRISON AND YOUNG OFFENDER INSTITUTE INMATES/IMMIGRATION REMOVAL CENTRE DETAINEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO SUCCESSFULLY ADAPT TO LIFE WITHIN THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE.
Area of benefit
IN THE UK AND ABROAD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 100
The Mercure George Hotel
10-12 King Street
Reading
RG1 2HE
- Phone:
- 01189573445
- Email:
- info@touchstoneprojects.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window