Accounts and annual returns BOUNTY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1121039
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 30 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 24 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required