FAMILY EMPOWERMENT NETWORK INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Family Empowerment Network International ( FENET International) provides services to disadvantaged communities in the UK and in Africa and projects include the provision of education and training, Health and well-being, Advice, information and signposting, economic development, and empowerment, environmental protection and community cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Throughout London
- Benin
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Uganda
Governance
- 16 April 2008: Standard registration
- FAMILY EMPOWERMENT NETWORK (Previous name)
- NEWCASTLE ACHIMO CLUB (Previous name)
- THE ACHIMO FAMILY CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Lamunu | Chair | 29 March 2019 |
|
|||||
VIVIAN LORD-MENSAH | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Odhiambo | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.02k | £9.02k | £9.50k | £5.25k | £5.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.91k | £8.92k | £4.36k | £5.20k | £5.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 04/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 11/05/2013 as amended on 18 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS("THE OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR FAMILIES (A) IN THE UK AND (B) IN AFRICA BY; 1)PRESERVING AND PROTECTING THE HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY HELPING TO CONTROL INFECTION SUCH AS HIV/AIDS, SEXUAL TRANSMITTED INFECTIONS, TB AND MALARIA, AND BY ASSISTING THOSE AT RISK OF MALNUTRITION AND BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FREE AND CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE, COUNSELLING 2) ADVANCING EDUCATION/TRAINING AND RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE REFERRALS/SIGNPOSTING; 3) PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITION OF LIFE, AND ASSISTING THEM ADAPT WITHIN NEW COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE CONTINENTS OF UNITED KINGDOM AND AFRICA COUNTRIES OF ENGLAND AND WALES, UGANDA, ETHIOPIA, KENYA AND SOUTH SUDAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
G10 Tottenham Town Hall
Town Hall Approach Road
LONDON
N15 4RY
- Phone:
- 07526622237
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window