Financial history IGLOO ARTISTS LTD

Charity number: 1124325
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £47.32k £104.46k £27.23k £10.00k £17.05k
Total expenditure £43.98k £102.02k £27.34k £5.68k £14.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £85.80k £8.20k N/A N/A