REMINISCENCE REUNION CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE REMINISCENCE REUNION CLUB (RRC) AIMS TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA, AND THEIR CARERS, THROUGH ACTIVITIES, SOCIAL EVENTS AND A NETWORK OF SUPPORT. WE USE REMINISCING ABOUT THE PAST AS A WAY OF ENGAGING PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA, AND THIS ALSO PROVIDES THE FOCUS FOR ENJOYABLE ACTIVITIES FOR CARERS. OUR AIM IS TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR AS LONG AS IT IS NEEDED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greenwich
Governance
- 19 May 2008: Standard registration
- 18 August 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 18 August 2015: Funds transferred to 326899 AGE EXCHANGE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.78k | £5.36k | £2.67k | £1.41k | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.54k | £4.10k | £3.11k | £2.10k | £1.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 25 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 13 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 24 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS IN LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PRACTICE OF REMINISCENCE. 2) TO HELP PROMOTE THE GOOD HEALTH OF THOSE CARING FOR PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH, INCLUDING RELIEVING THE STRESS OF CARING, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING EMOTIONAL SUPPORT. 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, AND CARERS, IN MATTERS RELATING TO DEMENTIA, INCLUDING CARE ISSUES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window