CHALLENGE AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our goal is to help people help themselves out of poverty. We build successful social enterprises to sustainably fund; care, food and education for orphans, community centres, installation of water, sanitation and electricity systems, support for teachers and healthcare workers, HIV prevention projects, AIDS counselling and physiotherapy and the provision of family grants and enterprise support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
- Kenya
Governance
- 09 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAPHAEL BRUNEAU | Chair | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Skeels | Trustee | 05 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSE MARY PARKER | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
BETHANY DAVIES | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELEANORE DICKSON Mrs | Trustee | 09 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL OGBORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE FREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.00k | £13.21k | £31.50k | £9.09k | £22.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.91k | £4.35k | £10.13k | £19.59k | £20.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 22 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
* THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN WAGUSU VILLAGE AND ABIMBO VILLAGE, IN NYANG'OMA SUB LOCATION OF CENTRAL SAKWA IN BONDO DISTRICT, NYANZA PROVINCE, WESTERN KENYA, BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. * THE RELIEF OF ORPHANS, VULNERABLE CHILDREN AND THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN WAGUSU VILLAGE AND ABIMBO VILLAGE, KENYA, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS GOODS AND SERVICES. * TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF WAGUSU AND ABIMBO, KENYA, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. * TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MEMBERS OF WAGUSU AND ABIMBO COMMUNITY, BY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND BY THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. (SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS 'DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS'.)
Area of benefit
WAGUSU VILLAGE AND ABIMBO VILLAGE, IN NYANG'OMA SUB LOCATION OF CENTRAL SAKWA, BONDO DISTRICT, NYANZA ROVINCE, WESTERN KENYA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Challenge Africa Office
The Retreat
Forester Road
Bath
BA2 6QG
- Phone:
- 07900392345
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window