Financial history ROCHESTER INDOOR SKATEPARK CLUB

Charity Number: 1120800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £118.02k £96.33k £119.10k £87.63k £108.05k
Total expenditure £101.45k £94.66k £105.77k £110.61k £111.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.14k
Income from government grants £30.78k £38.12k £15.20k £3.02k N/A