ROCHESTER INDOOR SKATEPARK CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision of indoor skatepark facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £4,140 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 06 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard william Hampton | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOEL SIMS | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
LUCILLE ARNOLD | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.02k | £96.33k | £119.10k | £87.63k | £108.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.45k | £94.66k | £105.77k | £110.61k | £111.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.14k | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.78k | £38.12k | £15.20k | £3.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 February 2023 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 10 February 2023 | 255 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ASSOCIATION OF ARTICLES 2 JULY 2007, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 31 AUGUST 2007 AND 12 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN ROCHESTER, KENT AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY, AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, MEDWAY, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1B Laker Road
ROCHESTER
ME1 3QX
- Phone:
- 01634400706
- Email:
- kathy.skatepark@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window