Financial history ST URSULA'S SCHOOLS PFA

Charity number: 1121134
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £10.85k £12.53k £10.81k £11.74k £10.90k
Total expenditure £9.56k £10.45k £10.62k £13.21k £10.50k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A