MORNING STAR MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity helps to run a church offering regular Christian services of worship and teaching. We help run a residential school for poor children who would not otherwise be able to receive an education. We relieve sickness and preserve health, facilitating health care by professional Drs, therapists & nurses at hospitals in India. We relieve financial hardship by providing grants to the destitute.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- India
Governance
- 18 September 2007: Standard registration
- 02 April 2019: Funds received from 1100368 FRISHTA SCHOOL & ORPHANAGE
- MORNING STAR FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Anthony Berrie | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Phil Overton | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Katherine Helen Pickford | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|||||
Jean Loveridge | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Eleanor Bettrys Rose | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.06k | £54.64k | £66.09k | £71.19k | £73.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.25k | £42.54k | £63.42k | £72.66k | £107.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE INDIAN SUB CONTINENT; 2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN INDIA; 3) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN INDIA BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING FOR OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
INDIA (OVERSEAS)
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 LEWIS ROAD
RADFORD SEMELE
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV31 1UB
- Phone:
- 01926833243
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window