ELLESMERE PORT AND NESTON COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a non profit making provider of minibus and adapted car travel, offering our services to community groups and individuals, elderly, disadvantaged or disabled in Cheshire West and Chester and Cheshire East and the surrounding areas. Our service provides essential, affordable transport to meet the local peoples' needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 02 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM JOHN FAIR | Chair | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Stride | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Jones | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAT KYNASTON | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR RON CANDELAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA CANDELAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.33k | £68.00k | £34.82k | £41.85k | £61.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.65k | £68.00k | £45.38k | £44.26k | £54.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 03 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH ON THE INHABITANTS OF ELLESMERE PORT & NESTON COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LTD (SEE MAP, ATTACHED) WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY, OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OR ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
ELLESMERE PORT & NESTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT A3
STANLAW ABBEY BUSINESS CENTRE
DOVER DRIVE
ELLESMERE PORT
CH65 9BF
- Phone:
- 01513553739
- Email:
- epncta@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window