Governing document FUTURES HOMEWAY LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
4.1 THE COMPANY SHALL NOT TRADE FOR PROFIT. THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS SHALL BE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF:- 4.1.1 PROVIDING HOUSES, HOSTELS OR ANY OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING, AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS: - IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; - WHO ARE AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY), OR CHRONICALLY SICK, AND ARE IN NEED OF THE ACCOMMODATION OR OTHER BENEFITS PROVIDED BY VIRTUE OF THEIR CONDITION; - FOR WHOM IT WOULD BE CHARITABLE TO PROVIDE HOUSES, HOSTELS OR OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION. 4.1.2 PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF IN ARRANGING OR CARRYING OUT WORKS OF IMPROVEMENT REPAIR OR MAINTENANCE TO HOMES OCCUPIED BY THEM AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 4.1.3 PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OR RECREATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE COMMUNITY; 4.1.4 PROMOTING OR CARRYING OUT ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A COMPANY WHICH IS ALSO A REGISTERED PROVIDER; 4.1.5 ASSISTING OR ADVISING ANY OTHER CHARITY OR NON-PROFIT DISTRIBUTING BODY WITH SIMILAR OBJECTS TO THE ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.