NDORO CHILDREN'S CHARITIES

Charity number: 1120984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide opportunity to as many children as possible in underprivileged Africa by focusing on the development of education, health promotion initiatives and social service in areas where other agencies have not yet ventured and by working in collaboration with other agencies in the UK. We are currently working to provide an orphanage home, school and clinic for children in Zimbabwe. Your donatio

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £4,445
Total expenditure: £3,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Islington
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 September 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSELINE CHITEPO NDORO Chair
None on record
GLADYS BOTCHWAY Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
Ronald Ndoro Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.47k £4.31k £4.49k £3.11k £4.45k
Total expenditure £216 £216 £2.81k £954 £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 September 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 September 2024 438 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 July 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
48 SIXTH CROSS ROAD
TWICKENHAM
TW2 5PD
Phone:
02089434597