SOLIHULL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education by maintaining an independent day school for boys and girls in Solihull which shall have a religious character in accordance with the tenets of the Church of England and provide a liberal education. The charity provides financial assistance to individuals of ability who cannot afford the fees and offers its facilities to other local organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£26,227,012
Donations and legacies | £1.98m | |
Charitable activities | £21.87m | |
Other trading activities | £1.08m | |
Investments | £1.29m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£24,159,892
Raising funds | £209.47k | |
Charitable activities | £23.95m | |
Other | £0 |
£959,679 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £69,721 from 27 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £209.47k | |
Charitable expenditure | £23.95m | |
Retained for future use | £2.07m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £209.47k | |
Charitable expenditure | £23.95m | |
Retained for future use | £3.03m |
People

268 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 20 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gwynedd
- Solihull
Governance
- 13 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Damian James Kelly | Chair | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Robert Nicolas Parker | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
Christopher Mark Pullen | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jason Andrew Denholm Dalby | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Jane Haslam | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
NICHOLAS RICHARD HURRELL | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Fenella Elizabeth Mary De Minckwitz | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Carol McNidder | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Elizabeth Tillman | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Ralph FCA | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
HELEN ELLIS | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
Judith Anita Hetherington FCA | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
DR ANDREW JOHN BURTENSHAW MBChB MRCP | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
PROF SWAREN PREET SINGH MBBS MD | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL GEOFFREY NEWBY | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.25m | £20.51m | £21.28m | £22.71m | £26.23m | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.24m | £19.89m | £21.41m | £22.64m | £24.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £413.40k | £147.80k | £196 | £60.22k | £69.72k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £965.92k | £218.74k | £477.98k | £301.01k | £1.98m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.23m | £721.71k | £801.18k | £921.33k | £1.08m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £14.64m | £18.45m | £18.78m | £20.17m | £21.87m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £215.92k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.22m | £1.12m | £1.22m | £1.32m | £1.29m | |
|
Income - Other | £6.19m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £750.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.71m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £18.06m | £19.71m | £21.17m | £22.42m | £23.95m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £185.03k | £178.45k | £233.89k | £227.67k | £209.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £211.89k | £145.59k | £129.36k | £114.61k | £127.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £825 | £925 | £1.25k | £1.35k | £1.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £185.03k | £130.63k | £182.41k | £146.14k | £191.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £39.67m | £39.40m | £40.90m | £40.40m | £41.41m | |
|
Long-term investments | £19.06m | £20.66m | £20.32m | £20.08m | £20.99m | |
|
Other assets | £4.37m | £3.49m | £2.51m | £3.39m | £12.88m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.93m | £5.04m | £5.63m | £6.07m | £14.44m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 DECEMBER 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/12/2014 as amended on 16 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY MAINTAINING AN INDEPENDENT DAY SCHOOL ('THE SCHOOL') FOR BOYS AND GIRLS IN SOLIHULL, WHICH SHALL HAVE A RELIGIOUS CHARACTER IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND PROVIDE A LIBERAL EDUCATION. 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT (A) ST ALPHEGE INFANT AND JUNIOR SCHOOLS, SOLIHULL AND (B) ST JAMES' CHURCH OF ENGLAND JUNIOR SCHOOL, SHIRLEY BY MAKING ANNUAL DONATIONS OF ·200 EACH (OR SUCH LARGER SUMS AS THE GOVERNORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT SUCH SCHOOLS. 3.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY MAKING ANNUAL DONATIONS TO THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST ALPHEGE, SOLIHULL AND THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST JAMES THE GREAT, SHIRLEY. 3.4 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, AGE, ILL HEALTH, OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED IN THE PARISH OF ST JAMES THE GREAT, SHIRLEY AND THE PARISH OF ST ALPHEGE, SOLIHULL BY MAKING ANNUAL DONATIONS FOR THOSE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
SOLIHULL
Linked charities
- ALICE HARDING MEMORIAL SCIENCE FUND
- ANDREW STEVENS PRIZE FOR LEADERSHIP
- ARTHUR JAMES COOPER SCIENCE SCHOLARSHIP
- BERNAYS READING AND ENGLISH PRIZES
- BLUCK PRIZE FOR SERVICE AND LEADERSHIP
- BUSHELL DIVINITY FUND
- D SHEPHERDSON FUND
- DAVID BLYTH FIELD STUDIES AWARD
- DAVID CAULKIN MEMORIAL PRIZE
- DAVID PRUST MEMORIAL HISTORY PRIZE
- DR BERNAYS MEMORIAL FUND
- DR E ST JOHN WHITEHOUSE PRIZE FOR BIOLOGY
- E G WILCOX FUND
- ERIC HAVINDEN HISTORY PRIZE
- FRANCES TAYLOR FUND
- GEORGE ANGIER HARDING SCIENCE PRIZE
- HALSTEAD PRIZE FOR LEADERSHIP AND INITIATIVE IN JUNIOR SCHOOL
- HALSTEAD PRIZE FOR READING IN LOWER SCHOOL
- HALSTEAD PRIZE FOR RHETORIC IN LOWER AND JUNIOR SCHOOLS
- HIRST MEMORIAL FUND
- JOHN HUNTER PRIZE FOR FRENCH
- KIMBERLEY PRIZE
- M WESTON SMITH PRIZE FOR ACADEMIC ENDEAVOR
- PETER BUDD MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- PETER KEYTE MEMORIAL FUND
- QUARTER CENTENARY APPEAL
- SIMON LEITNER MEMORIAL FUND
- THOMAS CANNON BROOKES FUND
- TIMOTHY POWELL PRIZE
- TREVOR BLUNDELL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- W F BUSHELL TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIP
- WRIGHT SCIENCE PRIZE FOR PROFICIENCY IN SCIENTIFIC METHOD
- 13 January 2009 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOLIHULL SCHOOL
793 WARWICK ROAD
SOLIHULL
B91 3DJ
- Phone:
- 01217050883
- Email:
- clerk@solsch.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window