ELMONADILLA SUDANESE COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
parent groups training workshops and outreach advice for refugee families in social welfare and health care needs where its needed. also lighting parents about the new curriculum in schools
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Sudan
Governance
- 28 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TALAL OSMAN | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
HUSNA KADOMA ELHADI | Trustee | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
RANA FARAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 322 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 April 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SUDANESE COMMUNITY AND OTHER ARABIC SPEAKING COMMUNITIES RESIDING IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA, IN PARTICULAR FROM THE SAID BENEFICIARIES RESIDING IN THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER AND DISPLACED IN HOMELAND SUDAN OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD. 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST THE SAID BENEFICIARIES. 3. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 BURNS ROAD
LONDON
NW10 4DT
- Phone:
- 07437977533
- Email:
- elmonadilla@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window