THE FUTURE VISION TRUST - ALMUSTAKBAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of finanacial hardship amongst women in poor communities in Palestine by enabling them to establish and grow their own business through the provision of micro-finance and technical assisstance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Oxfordshire
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 19 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IMAN ABU ATA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RAYA TIBAWI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIYAZ MUGHAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £175 | £1.20k | £280 | £375 | |
|
Total expenditure | £750 | £75 | £900 | £100 | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 March 2021 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 2 AUGUST 2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION 28 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN POOR COMMUNITIES IN PALESTINE BY ENABLING THEM TO ESTABLISH AND GROW THEIR OWN BUSINESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MICRO-FINANCE AND TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
PALESTINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
283 Green Lanes
LONDON
N13 4XS
- Phone:
- 02079355573
- Email:
- info@futurevisiontrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window