Children's Hearts UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Children's Heart Federation is the leading children's heart charity supporting children with congenital heart disease and their families and the umbrella body for voluntary organisations working to meet the needs of children and young people with heart conditions and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 August 2007: Standard registration
- 29 October 2015: Funds received from 800877 CHILDREN'S HEART SUPPORT NETWORK
- CHILDRENS HEART FEDERATION (Previous name)
- THE CHILDRENS HEART FEDERATION (Previous name)
- THE CHILDRENS HEART FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE SHENINE WOOTTON | Chair |
|
||||||
Trisha Dionne McCauley | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Craven | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Tomlin | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS STRINGFELLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL WILLGOSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD IAN PREEDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.12k | £75.35k | £207.31k | £164.59k | £182.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.54k | £61.50k | £88.61k | £128.07k | £176.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 JULY 2007 as amended on 23 Sept 2023
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM HEART CONDITIONS AND PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR THEIR FAMILIES 2 TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT THE PROBLEMS EXPERIENCED BY CHILDREN WITH HEART CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 12
The Centre
Lakes Industrial Park
BRAINTREE
Essex
CM7 3RU
- Phone:
- 0300 561 0065
- Email:
- info@chfed.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window