Financial history CLOCAENOG PLAYGROUND PROJECT

Charity number: 1122505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £903 £14.90k £0 £0 £662
Total expenditure £559 £4.39k £9.20k £280 £1.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A