THE INTERNATIONAL POLAR FOUNDATION - UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF ALL ASPECTS OF EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY WITH REGARD TO: SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH IN THE POLAR REGIONS AND ITS CONTRIBUTION TO THE GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF CLIMATE CHANGE; THE ARCTIC INDIGENOUS PEOPLES; THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE POLAR HABITAT AND ENVIRONMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR ANDREW BURNS KCMG | Chair | 04 May 2006 |
|
|||||
DR MARK BRANDON | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ARABELLA SLINGER | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
NIGHAT JOHNSON-AMIN | Trustee | 04 May 2006 |
|
|
||||
ALAIN HUBERT | Trustee | 04 May 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £20.28k | £40 | £43 | £285 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £30 | £40 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF ALL ASPECTS OF EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY WITH REGARD TO: SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH IN THE POLAR REGIONS AND ITS CONTRIBUTION TO THE GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF CLIMATE CHANGE; THE ARCTIC INDIGENOUS PEOPLES; THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE POLAR HABITAT AND ENVIRONMENT; AND THE STRATEGIES AVAILABLE FOR MITIGATION AND ADAPTATION IN RESPONSE TO CLIMATE CHANGE, SO AS TO ADVANCE THE KNOWLEDGE OF BOTH THE POLAR REGIONS, CLIMATE CHANGE AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER INTERNATIONAL POLAR FOUNDATION OFFICES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD ("THE OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 7
Overstrand Mansions
Prince of Wales Drive
London
SW11 4HA
- Phone:
- 02073374115
- Email:
- ipf_uk@polarfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window