Accounts and annual returns THE CLEVELAND ADVOCACY LIASON & MENTORING (CALM) TRUST

Charity number: 1120764
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2012 10 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2011 30 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 28 November 2011 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2010 21 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 17 September 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2009 27 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 15 September 2009 On Time