STREETS2HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects are the relief of poverty by the provision of advice, information and practical support particularly to homeless persons unable to provide their own accommodation because of their economic, social or health circumstances
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £195,409 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 16 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Winders | Chair | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Scott | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Reeves | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Toby Acton | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Elliot | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Holmes | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bartlett | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £478.80k | £280.89k | £473.96k | £377.55k | £308.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.89k | £362.17k | £325.54k | £359.61k | £370.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £140.47k | £209.47k | £280.00k | £266.97k | £195.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JULY 2007 as amended on 31 Mar 2021 as amended on 31 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT PARTICULARLY TO HOMELESS PERSONS UNABLE TO PROVIDE THEIR OWN ACCOMMODATION BECAUSE OF THEIR ECONOMIC, SOCIAL OR HEALTH CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Streets 2 Homes
2 Wych Elm
Harlow
CM20 1QP
- Phone:
- 07879498931
- Website:
-
streets2homes.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window