Financial history OUR LADY OF SION SCHOOL, WORTHING

Charity number: 1121398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £3.88m £3.92m £3.92m £4.18m £4.27m
Total expenditure £4.04m £4.32m £3.70m £4.04m £4.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £150.46k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.52k £175.07k £8.58k £2.16k £2.69k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.75m £3.53m £3.89m £4.16m £4.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £119.06k £35.85k £15.64k £17.74k £18.64k
Income - Other £3.42k £179.95k £11.25k £9.33k £9.58k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.99m £4.29m £3.67m £3.99m £4.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £48.40k £33.48k £29.83k £48.82k £33.63k
Expenditure - Governance £15.51k £0 £18.19k £21.62k £28.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £12.52k £0 £6.55k £15.94k £9.50k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0