Trustees OUR LADY OF SION SCHOOL, WORTHING
Charity number: 1121398

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHERINE HENWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Telfer | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Dahill | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cundy | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Sparks | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Antonio Puglia | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Rawlinson | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Warnett | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CALLAGHAN | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amit TALATI | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILL BUQUE | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LUCY HAMMOND-ILLES | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUSAN COLDWELL | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.