FOREST FARM PEACE GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Forest Farm Peace Garden is a therapeutic community garden which works with a broad cross-section of the community to promote health, wellbeing, inclusion, environmental sustainability, and intercultural awareness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Redbridge
Governance
- 29 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Katherina Decho | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Mayer | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Thomas Paul Blackburn | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.16k | £75.12k | £78.84k | £53.83k | £103.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.49k | £75.35k | £88.09k | £76.25k | £81.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | £453 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 14 JUNE 2006 (AMENDED) 07 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
1)TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ORGANIC GARDENING OPPORTUNITIES, CONSERVATION BASED ACTIVITIES, EDUCATION AND ONE TO ONE SUPPORT. 2)TO PRESERVE, PROTECT, AND IMPROVE THE PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT; IN PARTICULAR THROUGH ORGANIC GARDENING, PERMACULTURE, CONSERVATION, AND OTHER ECOLOGICALLY SOUND PRACTICES. 3) TO FOSTER A GENUINELY DIVERSE AND INTEGRATED COMMUNITY THROUGH: A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, ETHNIC ORIGIN, GENDER, AGE, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; B) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Forest Farm Peace Garden
2nd Floor
Ilford Chambers
11 Chapel Road
Ilford
Essex
- Phone:
- 020 8477 1655
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window