Financial history THE SCOTSDALE'S CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £18.37k £57.69k £35.04k £30.84k £34.75k
Total expenditure £17.10k £88.30k £62.52k £48.85k £26.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A