Financial history BARKING AND DAGENHAM CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1123253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £821.17k £733.83k £712.97k £522.06k £561.18k
Total expenditure £822.04k £719.60k £711.60k £527.30k £504.29k
Income from government contracts £387.70k £357.18k £352.98k £414.71k £404.93k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £202.12k £77.23k £63.12k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £156
Income - Other trading activities £0 £27.04k £5.55k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £820.79k £706.65k £707.41k £521.61k £557.78k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £380 £144 £19 £449 £3.24k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £822.04k £719.60k £711.60k £527.30k £504.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.55k £10.98k £12.81k £8.35k £6.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0