LINCOLN CHINESE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity activities include annual Chinese New Year celebration,Mid-Autumn Festival,Dragon Boat Festival,weekly luncheon club,day trips and badminton tournament.Chinese New Year celebration is a fund-raising event which helps the Association to generate income to support the local supplementary school to teach mother tongue language to children,Chinese art and culture promoted to the wider public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 09 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frederick Andrew Wong | Chair | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lin Tai Lau | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAM LAN LIU | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHOI HUNG RAINBOW PANG | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Man Cheung To | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.94k | £2 | £0 | £7.85k | £9.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.72k | £428 | £529 | £8.50k | £8.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF LINCOLN, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE CHINESE COMMUNITY, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE CHINESE PEOPLE AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY AND REDUCING ISOLATION AND LONELINESS.
Area of benefit
LINCOLN
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 MONKS ROAD
LINCOLN
LN2 5HY
- Phone:
- 07798910334
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window