WEST LONDON STUDENT TRUST (WLST)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
West London Students Trust fundraises in college and awards grants to students of Ealing Hammersmith and West London College or former students who are now in Higher education who are facing difficulty meeting their educational aims and objectives by awarding grants, donations and other payments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 24 May 2011: Standard registration
- 05 December 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.16k | £4.23k | £10 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.09k | £9.07k | £2.02k | £48.96k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 30 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 26 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 26 August 2016 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/09/2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECYS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF STUDENTS ATTENDING EALING, HAMMERSMITH AMD WEST LONDON COLLEGE (THE "COLLEGE") AND TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF STUDENTS ATTENDING THE COLLEGE AND / OR RECENT ALUMNI (WHO HAVE LEFT THE COLLEGE RECENTLY) WHO ARE FACING DIFFICULTY MEETING THEIR EDUCATIONAL AIMS AND OBJECTIVES (INCLUDING THOSE LINKED TO ONWARD PROGRESSION), BY AWARDING GRANTS, DONATIONS AND OTHER PAYMENTS, WHETHER IN CASH OR IN KIND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window