MISSION POSSIBLE UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of religion, education of young people, relief of financial hardship and relief of sickness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Albania
- Bulgaria
- Burundi
- Malawi
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Tanzania
Governance
- 26 September 2007: Standard registration
- 10 February 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1061526 CHRISTIAN HOPE INTERNATIONAL
- MPUK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.24k | £208.12k | £299.21k | £200.30k | £181.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.74k | £244.87k | £252.89k | £216.11k | £332.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
1) ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WORLDWIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS, OTHER GATHERINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHER ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW CHURCHES AND THE EDUCATION OF CHRISTIANS. 2) EDUCATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE: TO DEVELOP THE CHRISTIAN FAITH OF YOUNG PEOPLE WORLDWIDE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES AND PROJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES IN SCHOOLS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND, WHERE THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, THE EQUIPPING AND BUILDING OF SCHOOL PREMISES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS SO THAT YOUNG PEOPLE MAY BE SUPPORTED IN THEIR PRACTICE OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN THEIR EVERYDAY LIFE. 3) RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP: THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES. 4) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window