DOWNRIGHT EXCELLENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational therapies for children with Downs Syndrome and their families/carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 14 September 2007: Standard registration
- DOWNWRIGHT EXCELLENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Davis | Chair | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Perovic-Lewis | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melody Yue Liang | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
RAJEELAN THAYALASEELAN | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nishad Gudhka | Trustee | 28 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243.99k | £240.72k | £176.54k | £151.13k | £192.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.02k | £209.92k | £191.79k | £183.20k | £144.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 MARCH 2008 as amended on 22 Jul 2020 as amended on 18 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
To help children with Down syndrome to develop their life skills so they may reach their full potential as individuals and equally participating members of society through, especially but not exclusively: • educational programmes; • quality play; • education and support for parents and carers; and • education and support for siblings
Area of benefit
IN LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 MOUNT PLEASANT ROAD
LONDON
NW10 3EL
- Phone:
- 07973 155606
- Email:
- chair@downrightexcellent.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window