Accounts and annual returns YOUTH MATTERS
Charity number: 1121393
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 31 August 2011 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | 10 October 2011 | 163 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 30 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | 11 August 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 01 September 2009 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | 25 August 2009 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window