HOPING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hoping Foundation supports Palestinian refugee children and their families by providing grants to community projects that are concerned with improving children's lives through education, art, music, social and sporting activities and better health. We provide for a wide range of activities, from scholarships, to creative workshops and basic infrastructure of local activity centres.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Syria
Governance
- 01 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KARMA NABULSI | Chair | 01 October 2007 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUDHIR HAZAREESINGH | Trustee | 31 October 2007 |
|
|
||||
JAMES FOX | Trustee | 31 October 2007 |
|
|
||||
BELLA FREUD | Trustee | 01 October 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.80k | £103.78k | £154.56k | £174.81k | £149.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.68k | £156.17k | £143.27k | £170.47k | £170.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
A) FOR SUCH PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS ARE NOW AND AT ANY TIME IN THE FUTURE REGARDED AS CHARITABLE IN LAW PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF MONETARY GRANTS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE: I) FOR THE BENEFIT OF PALESTINIAN REFUGEE CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE MIDDLE EAST WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES OR, THROUGH THEIR ECONOMIC, SOCIAL OR OTHER CIRCUMSTANCES, LACK ACCESS TO FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION; OR II) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE WITH CAPACITY-BUILDING COMMUNITY PROJECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS. B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS OR THE DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM OF PALESTINIAN REFUGEE CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES, AND OTHERS OF CONCERN TO THE UNITED NATIONS RELIEF AND WORKS AGENCY FOR PALESTINE REFUGEES IN THE NEAR EAST (UNWRA), IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD. C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO PALESTINIAN REFUGEE CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 OLD GLOUCESTER STREET
LONDON
WC1N 3XX
- Phone:
- 02031376188
- Email:
- hoping@hopingfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window